House | 04/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 1679 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1438 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1438 | |
House | 03/28/2013 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Filed |