Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1823
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|