E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5443 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5440 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3756 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4871 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4915 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4552 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2908 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1823 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1823 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Filed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | RV#281 | Journal Page: 1768 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1768 |