Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB419 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 419
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 6, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 6, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating the first Friday in November as Texas Arbor
 Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.056.  TEXAS ARBOR DAY. (a) The first Friday in
 November of each year is Texas Arbor Day to encourage the planting
 and cultivation of forest, shade, and ornamental trees throughout
 the state.
 (b)  Texas Arbor Day shall be regularly observed by
 appropriate ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *