Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB432 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Riddle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 432
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 25, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to charitable contributions by state employees to assist
 domestic victims of human trafficking.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.383, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  For purposes of Subchapter I, Chapter 659:
 (1)  the commission, for the sole purpose of
 administering the grant program under this section, is considered
 an eligible charitable organization entitled to participate in the
 state employee charitable campaign; and
 (2)  a state employee is entitled to authorize a
 deduction for contributions to the commission for the purposes of
 administering the grant program under this section as a charitable
 contribution under Section 659.132, and the commission may use the
 contributions as provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *