Senate | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1114 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1083 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | RV#233 | Journal Page: 1663 |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1663 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1663 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 964 | |
House | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 308 | |
House | 01/10/2013 | Filed |