Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB442 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Munoz, Jr., et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 442
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recognition of a portion of U.S. Highway 83 as a
 memorial to Trooper Eduardo Chavez.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.091 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.091.  TROOPER EDUARDO CHAVEZ MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)
 The portion of U.S. Highway 83 in Starr County from the eastern
 boundary of Starr County to Farm-to-Market Road 2360 or the most
 appropriate point west of Farm-to-Market Road 2360, as determined
 by the department, shall serve as a memorial to Trooper Eduardo
 Chavez.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating that the
 portion of U.S. Highway 83 described in Subsection (a) is a memorial
 to Trooper Eduardo Chavez, and any other appropriate information;
 and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *