E
|
05/25/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5391
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
E
|
05/14/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3205
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3192
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1195
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1636
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1636
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1457
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
House
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
House
|
01/10/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|