House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1225 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 310 | |
House | 02/11/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 310 | |
House | 01/10/2013 | Filed |