Senate | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 810 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1531 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1488 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#197 | Journal Page: 1487 |
House | 04/10/2013 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1487 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Amended | 1-J. Davis | Journal Page: 1487 |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1487 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1468 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | 5-Burnam, Moody, Capriglione, and Stickland | Journal Page: 1468 |
House | 04/09/2013 | Amended | 4-Simmons, Keffer, Y. Davis, and Parker | Journal Page: 1468 |
House | 04/09/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1467 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | RV#189 | Journal Page: 1467 |
House | 04/09/2013 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1466 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1465 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-J. Davis | Journal Page: 1465 |
House | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1465 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1005 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 337 | |
House | 01/11/2013 | Filed |