E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5391 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3515 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4535 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4555 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4072 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2415 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2559 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2035 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1709 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#555 | Journal Page: 2479 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2479 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2479 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/04/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 230 | |
House | 02/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 230 | |
House | 11/12/2012 | Filed |