Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB48 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Flynn, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 48
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedure under which a person may renew a license
 to carry a concealed handgun.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.185, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 411.185.  LICENSE RENEWAL PROCEDURE.  (a) To renew a
 license, a license holder must, on or before the date the license
 expires,[:
 [(1)     complete a continuing education course in handgun
 proficiency under Section 411.188(c) within the six-month period
 preceding:
 [(A)     the date of application for renewal, for a
 first or second renewal; and
 [(B)     the date of application for renewal or the
 date of application for the preceding renewal, for a third or
 subsequent renewal, to ensure that the license holder is not
 required to complete the course more than once in any 10-year
 period; and
 [(2)]  submit to the department by mail or, in
 accordance with the procedure adopted under Subsection (f), on the
 Internet:
 (1)  a [(A)  an application for] renewal application
 on a form provided by the department;
 (2)  [(B)     evidence of handgun proficiency, in the form
 and manner required by the department;
 [(C)]  payment of a nonrefundable renewal fee as
 set by the department; and
 (3)  the informational form described by Subsection (c)
 signed or electronically acknowledged by the applicant [(D)     one or
 more photographs of the applicant that meet the requirements of the
 department].
 (b)  The director by rule shall adopt a renewal application
 form requiring an update of the information on the original
 completed application. The director by rule shall set the renewal
 fee in an amount that is sufficient to cover the actual cost to the
 department to:
 (1)  verify the information contained in the renewal
 application form;
 (2)  conduct any necessary investigation concerning
 the license holder's continued eligibility to hold [renew] a
 license; and
 (3)  issue the renewed license.
 (c)  The director by rule shall adopt an informational form
 that describes state law regarding the use of deadly force and the
 places where it is unlawful for the holder of a license issued under
 this subchapter to carry a concealed handgun. An applicant for a
 renewed license must sign and return the informational form to the
 department by mail or acknowledge the form electronically on the
 Internet according to the procedure adopted under Subsection (f).
 (d)  Not later than the 60th day before the expiration date
 of the license, the department shall mail to each license holder a
 written notice of the expiration of the license, [and] a renewal
 application form, and the informational form described by
 Subsection (c).
 (e) [(c)]  The department shall renew the license of a
 license holder who meets all the eligibility requirements to
 continue to hold a license and submits all the renewal materials
 described by Subsection (a). Not later than the 45th day after
 receipt of the renewal materials, the department shall issue the
 renewed license [renewal] or notify the license holder in writing
 that the department denied the license holder's renewal application
 [was denied].
 (f) [(d)]  The director by rule shall adopt a procedure by
 which a license holder who satisfies the eligibility requirements
 to continue to hold a license [criteria] may submit the renewal
 materials described by Subsection (a) [renew a license] by mail or
 on the Internet. [The materials for renewal by mail must include a
 form to be signed and returned to the department by the applicant
 that describes state law regarding:
 [(1)  the use of deadly force; and
 [(2)     the places where it is unlawful for the holder of
 a license issued under this subchapter to carry a concealed
 handgun.]
 SECTION 2.  Sections 411.188(d), (g), and (k), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Only a qualified handgun instructor may administer the
 proficiency examination to obtain [or to renew] a license. The
 proficiency examination must include:
 (1)  a written section on the subjects listed in
 Subsection (b); and
 (2)  a physical demonstration of proficiency in the use
 of one or more handguns of specific categories and in handgun safety
 procedures.
 (g)  A person who wishes to obtain [or renew] a license to
 carry a concealed handgun must apply in person to a qualified
 handgun instructor to take the appropriate course in handgun
 proficiency and demonstrate handgun proficiency as required by the
 department.
 (k)  A qualified handgun instructor may submit to the
 department a written recommendation for disapproval of the
 application for a license[, renewal,] or modification of a license,
 accompanied by an affidavit stating personal knowledge or naming
 persons with personal knowledge of facts that lead the instructor
 to believe that an applicant does not possess the required handgun
 proficiency.  The department may use a written recommendation
 submitted under this subsection as the basis for denial of a license
 only if the department determines that the recommendation is made
 in good faith and is supported by a preponderance of the evidence.
 The department shall make a determination under this subsection not
 later than the 45th day after the date the department receives the
 written recommendation.  The 60-day period in which the department
 must take action under Section 411.177(b) is extended one day for
 each day a determination is pending under this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Section 411.1881(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 a person may not be required to complete the range instruction
 portion of a handgun proficiency course to obtain a [or renew a
 concealed handgun] license issued under this subchapter if the
 person:
 (1)  is currently serving in or is honorably discharged
 from:
 (A)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
 marine corps of the United States or an auxiliary service or reserve
 unit of one of those branches of the armed forces; or
 (B)  the state military forces, as defined by
 Section 431.001; and
 (2)  has, within the five years preceding the date of
 the person's application for the [an original or renewed] license[,
 as applicable], completed a course of training in handgun
 proficiency or familiarization as part of the person's service with
 the armed forces or state military forces.
 SECTION 4.  Section 411.201(g), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (g)  A license issued under this section expires as provided
 by Section 411.183 and[, except as otherwise provided by this
 subsection,] may be renewed in accordance with Section 411.185 [of
 this subchapter. An active judicial officer is not required to
 attend the classroom instruction part of the continuing education
 proficiency course to renew a license].
 SECTION 5.  Sections 411.188(c) and (j) and 411.199(e),
 Government Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The director of the Department of Public Safety
 shall adopt the rules required by Section 411.185, Government Code,
 as amended by this Act, as soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 application for the renewal of a license to carry a concealed
 handgun that is submitted to the Department of Public Safety on or
 after the effective date of this Act, regardless of whether the
 license was originally issued before, on, or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *