Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB480 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alvarado, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 480
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 7, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of sick leave by state employees who are
 attending educational activities of their children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 661.206, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 661.206.  EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES [PARENT-TEACHER
 CONFERENCE]: USE OF SICK LEAVE.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 661.206(b), (c), and (d), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An employee may use up to eight hours of sick leave each
 fiscal year to attend educational activities of [parent-teacher
 conference sessions for] the employee's children.
 (c)  An employee shall give reasonable advance notice of the
 employee's intention to use the sick leave to attend an educational
 activity [a parent-teacher conference].
 (d)  In this section:
 (1)  "Educational activity" means a school-sponsored
 activity, including a parent-teacher conference, tutoring, a
 volunteer program, a field trip, a classroom program, a school
 committee meeting, an academic competition, and an athletic, music,
 or theater program.
 (2)  "Employee" has the meaning assigned by Section
 661.001.
 (3) [(2)]  "Parent" means a person standing in parental
 relation.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *