House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1734 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 01/15/2013 | Filed |