House | 05/09/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 01/15/2013 | Filed |