E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5440 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3814 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4913 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4914 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4539 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2889 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2035 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1717 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 3041 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3035 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3035 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2721 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 367 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
House | 01/17/2013 | Filed |