Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB619 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: N. Gonzalez of El Paso (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 619
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for issuance of certain barbering and
 cosmetology licenses and certificates for applicants holding
 licenses issued by other states; imposing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 1601.265, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1601.265.  WAIVER OF CERTAIN LICENSE AND CERTIFICATE
 REQUIREMENTS; PERSONAL INTERVIEW.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1601.265, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (c) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall issue a license or certificate to
 an applicant for a license or certificate issued under Section
 1601.253, 1601.256, 1601.258, or 1601.259 if the applicant:
 (1)  submits an application on a form prescribed by the
 department;
 (2)  pays the application fee; and
 (3)  provides proof that the applicant holds a current
 license to engage in the same or a similar activity issued by
 another jurisdiction that has license requirements substantially
 equivalent to those of this state.
 (a-1)  The department may waive any [license] requirement
 for a license or certificate issued under this chapter, other than a
 license or certificate listed in Subsection (a), for an applicant
 holding a license from another state or country that has license
 requirements substantially equivalent to those of this state.
 (c)  A license or certificate issued under Subsection (a)
 must be renewed as provided by Subchapter I.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1602, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1602.268 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1602.268.  WAIVER OF CERTAIN LICENSE REQUIREMENTS. (a)
 The department shall issue a license to an applicant for a license
 issued under Section 1602.254 if the applicant:
 (1)  submits an application on a form prescribed by the
 department;
 (2)  pays the application fee; and
 (3)  provides proof that the applicant holds a current
 license to engage in the same or a similar activity issued by
 another state that has license requirements substantially
 equivalent to those of this state.
 (b)  The department may waive any requirement for a license
 or certificate issued under this chapter, other than a license
 listed in Subsection (a), for an applicant holding a license from
 another state that has license requirements substantially
 equivalent to those of this state.
 (c)  A license issued under Subsection (a) must be renewed as
 provided by Subchapter H.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for the issuance of a license or certificate under
 Chapters 1601 and 1602, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act,
 that is filed with the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation
 on or after the effective date of this Act. An application for the
 issuance of a license or certificate that is filed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the application was filed, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *