Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1114
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1114
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#235
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#230
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 1(b)
|
Journal Page: 1615
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
11-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1614
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
11-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
11-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
10-Capriglione
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
8-P. King
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
9-Phillips and Wu
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amended
|
7-Pickett and Moody
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-P. King
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 693
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
House
|
02/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
House
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|