E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5441 | |
E | 05/23/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4878 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4062 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4294 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3902 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2035 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1934 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 664 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1191 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1134 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | RV#119 | Journal Page: 1133 |
House | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1133 | |
House | 03/27/2013 | Amendment fails of adoption | 1-Hughes | Journal Page: 1132 |
House | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1132 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1100 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Record vote | RV#114 | Journal Page: 1099 |
House | 03/26/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1099 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 01/24/2013 | Filed |