Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB677 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Geren, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 677
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 2, 2013;
 April 4, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation and enforcement of dam safety by the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.052(e-1), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e-1)  The commission shall exempt an owner of a dam located
 on private property from meeting requirements related to dam safety
 if the dam:
 (1)  at maximum capacity impounds less than 500
 acre-feet;
 (2)  has a hazard classification of low or significant;
 (3)  is located in a county with a population of less
 than 350,000 [215,000]; and
 (4)  is not located inside the corporate limits of a
 municipality.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.052(e-3), Water Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *