Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB698 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 698
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain procedures for submitting legible and
 classifiable fingerprints with an application for a license to
 carry a concealed handgun.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.175 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.175.  PROCEDURES FOR SUBMITTING FINGERPRINTS. The
 department shall establish procedures for the submission of legible
 and classifiable fingerprints by an applicant for a license under
 this subchapter who:
 (1)  is required to submit those fingerprints to the
 department, including an applicant under Section 411.199,
 411.1991, or 411.201; and
 (2)  resides in a county having a population of 46,000
 or less and does not reside within a 25-mile radius of a facility
 with the capability to process digital or electronic fingerprints.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for a license to carry a concealed handgun that is
 submitted to the Department of Public Safety on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *