Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB701 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farney (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 701
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; April 23, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 23, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Corn Hill Regional Water Authority; providing
 authority to impose fees and taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8364.004(c), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The authority is created to accomplish:
 (1)  the control, storage, conservation, preservation,
 distribution, and use of water for domestic, industrial, municipal,
 and all other useful purposes as provided by Section 59, Article
 XVI, Texas Constitution;
 (2)  the reclamation and drainage of the district's
 overflowed lands and other lands needing drainage;
 (3)  the control, abatement, and change of any shortage
 or harmful excess of water; and
 (4)  the protection, preservation, and restoration of
 the purity and sanitary condition of water within the state.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 8364, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8364.052 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8364.052.  EX OFFICIO DIRECTORS. (a)  At any time, the
 board may by resolution:
 (1)  appoint a nonvoting ex officio director to serve
 at the pleasure of the board; and
 (2)  remove an ex officio director.
 (b)  An ex officio director:
 (1)  is entitled to all notices and information given
 to and accessible to a director; and
 (2)  may attend and participate in any board meeting.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8364.072(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A municipality, county, or other political subdivision
 may petition the board to add that municipality, county, or other
 political subdivision as a member entity.
 SECTION 4.  Section 8364.103, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8364.103.  MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT POWERS AND
 DUTIES; LIMITATIONS. (a)  Except as provided by Subsection
 [Subsections] (b) [and (c)], the authority has the powers and
 duties provided by the general law of this state, including
 Chapters 49 and 54, Water Code, applicable to municipal utility
 districts created under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution.
 (b)  The authority may not provide [wastewater, drainage,]
 solid waste disposal[,] or road facilities or services.
 [(c)     The authority does not have any power that the member
 entities do not have.]
 SECTION 5.  Section 8364.151(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For any authorized authority purpose, the authority may
 issue bonds or other obligations payable wholly or partly from
 revenue of the authority's water system, sanitary sewer system, or
 drainage system, including revenue from contracts with member
 entities or customers, or any combination of those sources of
 revenue.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter D, Chapter 8364, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8364.153 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8364.153.  FUNDING BY MEMBERS. Under a contract with
 the authority, a member entity may make payments from any of the
 member entity's sources of revenue, including ad valorem taxes,
 impact fees, grants, sales and use taxes, and any other source to
 provide money for the administrative and operating expenses of the
 authority.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *