1 | 1 | | By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 748 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to a waiver allowing the Department of Family and |
---|
11 | 11 | | Protective Services to use certain federal funds to test innovation |
---|
12 | 12 | | strategies in child welfare programs. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code, |
---|
15 | 15 | | is amended by adding Section 40.074 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 40.074. WAIVER TO USE FUNDS TO TEST INNOVATIONS TO |
---|
17 | 17 | | CHILD WELFARE PROGRAMS. (a) The department shall apply for and |
---|
18 | 18 | | actively pursue a waiver, as authorized by the Child and Family |
---|
19 | 19 | | Services Improvement and Innovation Act (Pub. L. No. 112-34), to |
---|
20 | 20 | | allow the department to use federal funds available under Title |
---|
21 | 21 | | IV-E, Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 670 et seq.), to |
---|
22 | 22 | | conduct demonstration projects to accomplish one or more of the |
---|
23 | 23 | | following goals: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) providing more permanency for children by reducing |
---|
25 | 25 | | time in foster care and promoting successful transitions to |
---|
26 | 26 | | adulthood for former foster youth; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) increasing positive outcomes for infants, |
---|
28 | 28 | | children, and families in their homes and communities and |
---|
29 | 29 | | increasing the safety and well-being of infants, children, and |
---|
30 | 30 | | youth; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (3) preventing child abuse and neglect and the reentry |
---|
32 | 32 | | of children into foster care. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (b) This section expires December 31, 2015. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
35 | 35 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
36 | 36 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
37 | 37 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
38 | 38 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
39 | 39 | | * * * * * |
---|