Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB748 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 748
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a waiver allowing the Department of Family and
 Protective Services to use certain federal funds to test innovation
 strategies in child welfare programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 40.074 to read as follows:
 Sec. 40.074.  WAIVER TO USE FUNDS TO TEST INNOVATIONS TO
 CHILD WELFARE PROGRAMS. (a) The department shall apply for and
 actively pursue a waiver, as authorized by the Child and Family
 Services Improvement and Innovation Act (Pub. L. No. 112-34), to
 allow the department to use federal funds available under Title
 IV-E, Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 670 et seq.), to
 conduct demonstration projects to accomplish one or more of the
 following goals:
 (1)  providing more permanency for children by reducing
 time in foster care and promoting successful transitions to
 adulthood for former foster youth;
 (2)  increasing positive outcomes for infants,
 children, and families in their homes and communities and
 increasing the safety and well-being of infants, children, and
 youth; and
 (3)  preventing child abuse and neglect and the reentry
 of children into foster care.
 (b)  This section expires December 31, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *