Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB749 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 749
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 22, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Rural Affairs, and Homeland Security; May 9, 2013,
 rereferred to Committee on Government Organization; May 14, 2013,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a plan to increase outcomes in the summer food service
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.00291 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.00291.  PLAN TO INCREASE OUTCOMES IN SUMMER FOOD
 SERVICE PROGRAM.  (a)  The department shall develop a five-year plan
 in collaboration with Baylor University's Texas Hunger Initiative
 and implement no-cost provisions to increase outcomes in the summer
 food service program under 42 U.S.C. Section 1761.  The plan must
 include:
 (1)  methods to increase participation by children
 eligible to receive free or reduced-price school lunches; and
 (2)  strategies to increase access to summer meals in
 rural areas for children eligible to receive free or reduced-price
 school lunches.
 (b)  In developing the plan, the department shall involve any
 appropriate department advisory committee that already exists and
 shall seek the participation of relevant stakeholders.
 (c)  Not later than November 1, 2014, the department shall
 submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house
 of representatives, and appropriate standing committees of the
 legislature the plan to be implemented over the next four years.
 (d)  The department may solicit and accept a gift, grant, or
 donation from any source, including a foundation or private entity,
 for the development of the plan.  The plan may be developed and
 implemented only if sufficient funds are available under this
 subsection for that purpose.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *