Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB762 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 762
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; May 9, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 9, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on disaster remediation contracts
 following a locally declared disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 57.001(3), Business & Commerce Code, as
 added by Chapter 979 (H.B. 1711), Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, is amended to read as follows:
 (3)  "Natural disaster" means the occurrence of
 widespread or severe damage, injury, or loss of life or property
 related to any natural cause, including fire, flood, earthquake,
 wind, storm, or wave action, that results in a disaster declaration
 by the governor or a local disaster declaration by a county judge
 under Chapter 418, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *