Senate | 05/13/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 705 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1428 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | RV#143 | Journal Page: 1222 |
House | 04/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1222 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1222 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1198 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1198 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 841 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 01/28/2013 | Filed |