Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2483 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#559 | Journal Page: 2482 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2482 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2440 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2440 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2440 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1531 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 01/29/2013 | Filed |