Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 737 | |
House | 04/05/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | RV#183 | Journal Page: 1416 |
House | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1416 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1416 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1223 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1223 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 406 | |
House | 01/30/2013 | Filed |