Senate | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3194 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Record vote | RV#761 | Journal Page: 3038 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3023 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Amended | 1-Carter | Journal Page: 3023 |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3023 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1456 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 423 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 423 | |
House | 01/31/2013 | Filed |