House | 05/04/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 921 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 540 | |
House | 02/27/2013 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 540 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 02/01/2013 | Filed |