House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 1725 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Point of order sustained | Rule 8, Section 3 | Journal Page: 1724 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1724 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 429 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
House | 02/04/2013 | Filed |