Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1511
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#574
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Branch
|
Journal Page: 2500
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2500
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/6/13 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amended
|
8-Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
6-Canales
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2440
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
House
|
02/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
House
|
02/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|