Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1385
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1385
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1317
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#372
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on Resolutions Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|