Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HCR1 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Branch (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.C.R. No. 1
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2013;
 May 2, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.C.R. No. 1 By:  Uresti


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, John Goodwin Tower greatly benefited his state and
 his nation through his dedicated public service, including nearly a
 quarter-century in the United States Senate; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Houston on September 29, 1925, John Tower
 served in the United States Navy during World War II on an
 amphibious gunboat in the Pacific; he was discharged as a seaman
 first class and remained active in the naval reserve until 1989,
 when he retired with the rank of master chief boatswain's mate; and
 WHEREAS, Senator Tower earned a bachelor's degree in
 political science at Southwestern University and a master's degree
 in the same discipline at Southern Methodist University; he
 accepted a position as an assistant professor at Midwestern
 University in the early 1950s and continued his studies at the
 London School of Economics; and
 WHEREAS, He soon became a rising star in conservative
 politics, and in 1960, he was elected as the first Republican
 senator from Texas since Reconstruction; Senator Tower took on
 numerous committee assignments in Washington and played a key role
 in the modernization and expansion of the military as chair of the
 Armed Services Committee and as a member of the Joint Committee on
 Defense Production; he also served on the Labor and Public Welfare
 and Banking and Currency Committees, among many others; he was
 known for his skill at guiding legislation through Congress, and he
 sought to stimulate economic growth, increase small business
 opportunities, improve transportation systems, and encourage
 strong financial institutions; working diligently in behalf of his
 fellow Texans, he promoted agriculture as well as the energy,
 fishing, and maritime industries; and
 WHEREAS, After retiring from Congress in 1985, Senator Tower
 served as President Ronald Reagan's strategic arms negotiator in
 Geneva, and he further assisted the president by advocating for
 ratification of a medium-range nuclear weapons treaty with the
 Soviet Union; in late 1986, President Reagan appointed him as chair
 of the special review board assigned to investigate the Iran-contra
 scandals; and
 WHEREAS, This dynamic Texan established a consulting company
 in Dallas that served some of the nation's largest weapons
 manufacturers, and from 1986 to 1988, he taught political science
 as a distinguished lecturer at Southern Methodist University; in
 1990, President Bush named him chair of the President's Foreign
 Intelligence Advisory Board; tragically, he died in a plane crash
 the following year; and
 WHEREAS, Through his leadership in national security and
 foreign policy issues, John Tower made vital contributions to the
 United States, and his tireless efforts to advance the interests of
 the Lone Star State earned the lasting appreciation of his fellow
 Texans; naming the State Insurance Building in the Capitol Complex
 in his honor would provide a most fitting tribute to his outstanding
 accomplishments; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 83rd Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby direct the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the State
 Insurance Building the John G. Tower State Office Building as a
 lasting tribute to this esteemed Texan; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That the secretary of state forward an official
 copy of this resolution to the chair and executive director of the
 Texas Facilities Commission.
 * * * * *