Senate | 05/20/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2046 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3596 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#924 | Journal Page: 3602 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3602 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3546 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3193 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 2153 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Filed |