House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2022 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Filed |