E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5443 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5440 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3779 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4871 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4915 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4552 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2909 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2909 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2909 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2909 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2257 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 2023 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Filed |