E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3911 | |
E | 05/09/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3091 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3020 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2760 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1008 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 849 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | RV#200 | Journal Page: 1521 |
House | 04/11/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1521 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/12/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/11/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 717 | |
House | 03/06/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 02/04/2013 | Filed |