E | 03/28/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1191 | |
E | 03/19/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 497 | |
House | 03/18/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 799 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 799 | |
House | 03/13/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 444 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 392 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/07/2013 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/05/2013 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/19/2013 | Filed |