H.C.R. No. 48 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the passing of admired civic leader George Pierce Cullum, Jr., of Dallas on January 4, 2013, at the age of 94; and WHEREAS, The son of George and Ethel Cullum, Mr. Cullum was born in Dallas on May 18, 1918; he earned his bachelor's degree in civil engineering from Southern Methodist University, and on April 11, 1942, he married the love of his life, the former Kathleen Moore; the couple became the parents of three treasured children, Linda, Mark, and Philip, and shared a fulfilling marriage that spanned nearly seven decades; and WHEREAS, Mr. Cullum served his country during World War II as a member of the Naval Construction Battalion; following demobilization, he joined the firm founded by his father and uncle, Cullum Construction Company, Inc.; he eventually brought the third and fourth generations of the family into the business; highly regarded in his field, he served as president of the Texas Heavy, Municipal and Utilities Branch of the Associated General Contractors of America, and he remained active in Cullum Construction well into his ninth decade; and WHEREAS, Deeply committed to his beloved hometown, Mr. Cullum chaired the Dallas City Plan Commission and the Park Cities Family YMCA, and he gave generously of his time and talents to many organizations, among them the Salesmanship Club of Dallas, Rotary Club of Dallas, and Dallas Country Club; moreover, he was a lifelong member of Oak Lawn United Methodist Church and served the North Texas Conference of the Methodist Church in a number of capacities; and WHEREAS, This proud SMU graduate was devoted to his alma mater, which named him a distinguished alumnus of the university and of the Bobby B. Lyle School of Engineering; his numerous accolades also included the Dallas Distinguished YMCA Leadership Award, the Lifetime Service Award from the Rotary Club, and the Brotherhood Citation from the Dallas Chapter of the National Conference of Christians and Jews; and WHEREAS, In his free time, Mr. Cullum enjoyed listening to music, playing piano and organ, and taking trips with his family and friends; he was particularly fond of travel by sea and took nearly 30 cruises; and WHEREAS, George Cullum was a man of great warmth and kindness; he left a lasting imprint on the city of Dallas through his professional achievements and his dedicated community service, and he will always be remembered with deep admiration by all who were privileged to know him; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 83rd Legislature of the State of Texas hereby pay tribute to the life of George Pierce Cullum, Jr., and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his children, Linda Cullum Tunnell and Ray, George Mark Cullum and Sally, and Philip Houston Cullum and Dale; to his grandchildren, James Cullum Brownlee and Wendy, Mark Christian Cullum and Becky, Leigh Cullum Langner and Jason, Carolina Cullum Martin and Matthew, Susannah Cullum McGown and Patrick, Elizabeth Cullum Clarke and Buddy, George Pierce Cullum III and Ali, and Callie Linda Cullum; to his great-grandchildren, Kamryn, Cullum, George, Drew, David, Elise, Daniel, and Holly; to his sister, Marion Cullum Griffith; and to his many other relatives and friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for the members of his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of George Pierce Cullum, Jr. Branch ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 48 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on March 7, 2013. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 48 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the Senate on March 12, 2013. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor