E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5443
|
E
|
05/22/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4555
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2482
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4062
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3899
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1574
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid before the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|