Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1694 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2768 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2768 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2756 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1440 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Filed |