E | 05/21/2013 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 4294 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3691 | |
House | 05/18/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3911 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3672 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1979 | |
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1978 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1669 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1669 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1384 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2113 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#428 | Journal Page: 2113 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2113 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2113 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1774 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 955 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 955 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |