Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR147 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.J.R. No. 147
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2013;
 May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 14, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2013, sent to printer.)


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment repealing the constitutional
 provision authorizing the creation of a hospital district in
 Hidalgo County.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7, Article IX, Texas Constitution, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment repealing Section 7,
 Article IX, Texas Constitution, which relates to the creation of a
 hospital district in Hidalgo County."
 * * * * *