House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2276 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1002 | |
House | 03/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1002 | |
House | 03/08/2013 | Filed |