E
|
05/28/2013
|
Filed with the Secretary of State
|
|
Journal Page: 5441
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3779
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4871
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4915
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2878
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2868
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2868
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1725
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3020
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#666
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-P. King
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
House
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
House
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|