Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR24 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Perry, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.J.R. No. 24
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 14, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of part of the
 market value of the residence homestead of a partially disabled
 veteran or the surviving spouse of a partially disabled veteran if
 the residence homestead was donated to the disabled veteran by a
 charitable organization.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1-b, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended by amending Subsection (j) and adding Subsection (l) to
 read as follows:
 (j)  The legislature by general law may provide that the
 surviving spouse of a [100 percent or totally] disabled veteran who
 qualified for an exemption in accordance with Subsection (i) or (l)
 of this section from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the
 market value of the disabled veteran's residence homestead when the
 disabled veteran died is entitled to an exemption from ad valorem
 taxation of the same portion of the market value of the same
 property to which the disabled veteran's exemption applied if:
 (1)  the surviving spouse has not remarried since the
 death of the disabled veteran; and
 (2)  the property:
 (A)  was the residence homestead of the surviving
 spouse when the disabled veteran died; and
 (B)  remains the residence homestead of the
 surviving spouse.
 (l)  The legislature by general law may provide that a
 partially disabled veteran is entitled to an exemption from ad
 valorem taxation of a percentage of the market value of the disabled
 veteran's residence homestead that is equal to the percentage of
 disability of the disabled veteran if the residence homestead was
 donated to the disabled veteran by a charitable organization at no
 cost to the disabled veteran.  The legislature by general law may
 provide additional eligibility requirements for the exemption. For
 purposes of this subsection, "partially disabled veteran" means a
 disabled veteran as described by Section 2(b) of this article who is
 certified as having a disability rating of less than 100 percent. A
 limitation or restriction on a disabled veteran's entitlement to an
 exemption under Section 2(b) of this article, or on the amount of an
 exemption under Section 2(b), does not apply to an exemption under
 this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of
 part of the market value of the residence homestead of a partially
 disabled veteran or the surviving spouse of a partially disabled
 veteran if the residence homestead was donated to the disabled
 veteran by a charitable organization."
 * * * * *