Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HJR74 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            83R14781 CJC-F
 By: Raymond, Hilderbran, Taylor, Deshotel, H.J.R. No. 74
 Branch, et al.
 Substitute the following for H.J.R. No. 74:
 By:  Button C.S.H.J.R. No. 74


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the taxation of
 the sale or use of certain food and medicine.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 28 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.  (a)  The legislature may not enact a general law
 that would impose a state tax on the sale or use of:
 (1)  a food product for human consumption that was not
 subject to taxation under Chapter 151, Tax Code, on January 1, 2013;
 or
 (2)  a medicine that was not subject to taxation under
 Chapter 151, Tax Code, on January 1, 2013.
 (b)  This section may not be construed in a manner that would
 result in prohibiting the state from entering into an interstate
 agreement to simplify the administration and collection of the
 state's sales and use tax.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 83rd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2013, prohibiting the taxation of the sale or use
 of certain food and medicine and expires December 31, 2015.
 (b)  If the 83rd Legislature, during the regular or a special
 session, enacts a general law prohibited by Section 28, Article
 VIII, of this constitution, the portion of the general law that
 violates that section expires January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prohibiting the
 imposition of a tax on the sale or use of certain food and
 medicine."