Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HR1743

Caption

Recognizing April 26, 2013, as McDonald's Salad Day.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX SR733

Recognizing May 7, 2015, as Salad Day 2015.

TX HR1613

Recognizing May 14, 2019, as Salad Day at the State Capitol and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.

TX HR980

Recognizing March 23, 2011, as Salad Day and commending the owner/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants.

TX HR2455

Recognizing May 7, 2015, as Salad Day and commending the owners/operators of Texas McDonald's restaurants for their contributions to the state's economy.

LA HR216

Commends the McDonald's Restaurant on Plank Road in Baton Rouge upon the celebration of its fiftieth anniversary

TX SR69

Recognizing the National Black McDonald's Operators Association on the occasion of its national convention.

TX HR739

Recognizing April 21, 2021, as McDonald's Virtual Legislative Day.

TX SR615

Recognizing March 23, 2011, as Salad Day at the State Capitol.